Pizzichini, Emilio (CPSO#: 67556)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Federal University of Parana, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2003