Place, Christopher Robert (CPSO#: 33444)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017