Plante, Daniel (CPSO#: 62296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Plante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Plante ( CPSO# 62296 )
Dr. J. Plante ( CPSO# 61185 )

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 5M2

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL PLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1992