Plante, Judith Chenoa (CPSO#: 61185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: Blore, Judith Chenoa (used until: 12 Aug 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
705 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

80 College St
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Canada
Phone: 416-967-2600
Fax: 416-961-8035
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Plante Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Plante ( CPSO# 62296 )
Dr. J. Plante ( CPSO# 61185 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8

Business Address:
201 Deacon Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 5M2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH CHENOA PLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLANTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991