Plantinga, Paul Timothy (CPSO#: 106642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32956
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL TIMOTHY PLANTINGA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PLANTINGA is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. PLANTINGA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PLANTINGA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PLANTINGA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PLANTINGA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PLANTINGA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 19 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018