Plata Aguilar, Ricardo (CPSO#: 84174)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Valle, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2006 to 02 Jun 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jun 2006 to 23 Jul 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neuroanaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2008