Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Platnick, Howard Allen (CPSO#: 58150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1008
2200 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2C6
Phone: (416) 482-8021
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Platnick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Platnick ( CPSO# 58150 )

Business Address:
1008 - 2200 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 482-8021

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD ALLEN PLATNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATNICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1988