Platzker, Tal (CPSO#: 100916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Phone: (416) 598-1703
Fax: (416) 598-1778
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAL PLATZKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATZKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2015