Plaxton, Patricia Anne (CPSO#: 61072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
345 Lakeshore Rd E #502
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE PLAXTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLAXTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1990