Plaxton, William Reynolds (CPSO#: 67882)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2631
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William R. Plaxton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Plaxton ( CPSO# 67882 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
P.O. Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM REYNOLDS PLAXTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLAXTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1999