Plener, Ian Saul (CPSO#: 98473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Affairs
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite 3SE 140
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite E324
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian S. Plener Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Plener ( CPSO# 98473 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite 3SE-140
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Medical Affairs
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Suite E-324
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN SAUL PLENER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLENER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016