Pliagas, George (CPSO#: 54484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2005


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Patras, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8700 Notting Hill Way
knoxville TN  37923
United States
Phone: 865-604-4640

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee


Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. GEORGE PLIAGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLIAGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005