Pliamm, Naomi (CPSO#: 77969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Champagne Centre
Unit A5
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone: (416) 661-1838
Fax: (416) 661-2831
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI PLIAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLIAMM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2004