Plint, Amy Catherine (CPSO#: 69496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: (613) 738-4885
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy Catherine Plint Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Plint ( CPSO# 69496 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1S 2P4
Phone Number: (613) 233-1171

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY CATHERINE PLINT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLINT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 May 1996 to 29 May 1996
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1996