Plioplys, Audrius Vaclovas (CPSO#: 51714)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Chicago, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 1990