Plosker, Shayne Mark (CPSO#: 51712)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008