Plourde, Joseph Jacques Philippe Pierre (CPSO#: 52950)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 1992