Plow-Jarvis, Lisa Grace (CPSO#: 65183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: Plow, Lisa Grace (used until: 20 Feb 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA GRACE PLOW-JARVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLOW-JARVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993