Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Plue, Gordon Franklyn (CPSO#: 67011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone: (905) 377-8544
Fax: (905) 377-0125
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon F. Plue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Plue ( CPSO# 67011 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone Number: (905) 377-8544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON FRANKLYN PLUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995