Po, Joseph Lysander (CPSO#: 68291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Cdn Fd Hosp Ottawa Surgical Det
c/o TOH Divsion of Critical Care
Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smythe Road, Rm LM-12 Box 206
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16405
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Critical Care
The Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Ave., Suite F202c
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 16405
Fax: (613) 761-5418
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH LYSANDER PO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Aug 2005 to 08 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Aug 2006 to 08 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1999