Po, Milton Chua (CPSO#: 65740)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999