Poblete, Roel Cara (CPSO#: 43548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Manila Central University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6150 Valley Way
Suite 108
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 1Y3
Phone: (905) 354-8354
Fax: (905) 354-8835
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3549 Bathurst
Toronto ON  M6A 2C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 781-0005
Fax: (416) 781-0444
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4631 Steeles Ave East
Scarborough ON  M1V 4S5
Canada
Phone: 416-291-8000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

45 Overlea Blvd.
Suite A6
Toronto ON  M4H 1C3
Canada
Phone: 1-416-6969836
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROEL CARA POBLETE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POBLETE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986