Pockey, Maurice (CPSO#: 21156)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002