Podell, Marc Jeffrey (CPSO#: 32926)

Current Status: Suspended as of 21 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Jan 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Michoacan Univ of San Nicolas de Hidalgo, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 7, 2014
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 13, 2014, Trillium Health Partners notified the College that Dr. Marc J. Podell's privileges were suspended, effective May 7, 2014.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1981
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 21 Dec 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: On November 28, 2016, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee referred the matter of Dr. Podell’s capacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 21 Dec 2016


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2016 Active

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 23 Jan 2017
Summary:

On January 23, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Podell has committed an act of 
professional  misconduct in that  he  engaged  in  an  act  or  omission  relevant  to  the  practice  of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional.  

Dr. Marc Jeffrey Podell is a physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing 
independent practice in 1981. Dr. Podell practiced as a surgical assistant at Trillium Health 
Partners (“the Hospital”) between 2003 and 2014. 
 
Between 2008 and 2014, Dr. Podell was repeatedly inaccessible during his on-call periods. Dr. 
Podell did not respond to pages, was frequently late and/or did not attend for emergency surgery 
while he was on call. His conduct jeopardized patient care as surgeons in emergent cases were 
forced to proceed without assistance. Although Dr. Podell asserted that he encountered 
difficulties with his pager and cell phone, he took insufficient steps to address the issue such that 
he could be available to the physicians and staff of the Hospital, despite numerous attempts by 
the Hospital to address this ongoing problem. 
 
Dr. Podell made repeated inappropriate comments in the operating room including commenting 
on the size and features of anesthetized patients. In April of 2009, Dr. Podell, while in the 
doctor’s lounge, amidst other physicians, made inappropriate comments while looking at pictures 
of women on a website entitled “Asian Kisses”.  
 
In May of 2013 Dr. Podell approached an 18 year old patient four times in two days, 
aggressively requesting cash payment of his fee for assisting at her laparoscopic appendicitis 
surgery in the Paediatrics unit. The patient was upset by this experience. Both nursing and social 
work staff felt that his advances towards the patient were harassing. Dr. Podell conducted 
himself in this manner even though he had been told several years prior to this incident to refrain 
from repeat demands for immediate payment from Quebec patients for his services. 
 
After speaking with the social worker who had assisted with the above incident, Dr. Podell 
inappropriately requested that she portray him in a more favorable light in her report. 
 
In April of 2014, in the Operating Room, Dr. Podell bumped into Nurse X. Nurse X felt that the 
physical contact was intentional, and filed a complaint against Dr. Podell. Dr. Podell reported 
that the contact was unintentional. Dr. Podell was asked not to have any contact with Nurse X. 
Nonetheless, he attempted to do so on three occasions, which Nurse X found intimidating.  
 
On May 7 of 2014 the Hospital suspended Dr. Podell’s privileges. Dr. Podell subsequently 
resigned his privileges on May 14, 2016. 
 
On January 23, 2017, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Podell’s certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months, 
   commencing immediately. 
-  The following terms, conditions and limitations be imposed on Dr. Podell’s certificate of 
   registration authorizing independent practice: 
  a) Upon his return to practice, Dr. Podell shall comply with the College’s Changing Scope 
     of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice policies, attached hereto as Appendix “A” and 
     Appendix “B”, if applicable. 
  b) Dr.  Podell shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen 
     (15) days of commencing practice at that location. 
  c)  Dr.  Podell shall, at his own expense: enter into an agreement with the Physician Health 
     Program (PHP), prior to returning to practice, which shall include workplace monitoring 
     as recommended by the PHP and reports to the College every six months. 
  d)  Dr. Podell shall comply with the agreement set out in (c) above. 
  e)  Dr. Podell shall consent to information-sharing/reporting between the College and the 
     workplace monitors, the PHP as well as any other persons necessary in order for the 
     College to receive information relevant to his compliance with these or any other terms of 
     the order.   
-  Dr. Podell appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Podell pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 by July 23, 2017. 
 

The reprimand was delivered after the conclusion of the hearing.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 23, 2017