Poggemiller, Gertrude Annette (CPSO#: 51709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Feb 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone: (416) 491-7700
Fax: (416) 491-7885
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. A. Poggemiller Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Poggemiller ( CPSO# 51709 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone Number: (416) 491-7700

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Feb 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 9, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gertrude Annette
            Poggemiller, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Poggemiller to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

                  Dr. Poggemiller shall not engage in the practice of emergency medicine.
                  Dr. Poggemiller's practice is restricted to office based family medicine.