Pohoski, Maria (CPSO#: 41369)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Polish School of Medicine (Edinburgh), 1948

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Apr 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2000