Poilly, Diane Nicola Francoise (CPSO#: 70881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Glengarry Memorial Hospital
20 260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone: (613) 525-2222
Fax: (613) 525-3215
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diane Poilly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Poilly ( CPSO# 70881 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
McConnell Site
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE NICOLA FRANCOISE POILLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POILLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 1997 to 20 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1996

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 10, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)