Poirier, Charles Dominique (CPSO#: 62214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pulmonary Department
CHUM
900 St-Denis street
Montreal QC  H2X 3H8
Phone: (514) 890-8000 Ext. 25124
Fax: (514) 412-7714

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES DOMINIQUE POIRIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POIRIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1991