Poirier, Nancy Claire (CPSO#: 72024)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004