Poirier-Groulx, Marie Cecile Lise (CPSO#: 53851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: Poirier, Marie Cecile Lise (used until: 15 May 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-7774 Ext. 1
Fax: (613) 830-3414
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lise Poirier-Groulx Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Poirier-Groulx ( CPSO# 53851 )

Business Address:
Suite 400
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-7774

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE CECILE LISE POIRIER-GROULX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POIRIER-GROULX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986