Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Poisson, Lucille Jacinte (CPSO#: 65023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lucille Poisson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Poisson ( CPSO# 65023 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCILLE JACINTE POISSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POISSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993