Pokoly, Thomas Bela (CPSO#: 21013)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997