Pokrant, Colleen Mary (CPSO#: 63309)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colleen M. Pokrant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Enviroshred 1580 Mountain Road Thunder Bay, Ontario P7J 1C6
Date Received: 08 Dec 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015