Pokrupa, Ronald Peter (CPSO#: 28994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6282
Fax: (613) 548-1346
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Health Sciences Center
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald P. Pokrupa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pokrupa ( CPSO# 28994 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3, Suite 361
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD PETER POKRUPA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POKRUPA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2001