Poldre, Pedro Antonio (CPSO#: 42668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4757
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 29 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PEDRO ANTONIO POLDRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLDRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1984