Poleski, Martin Henry (CPSO#: 44239)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1998