Polevoy, Terry Alan (CPSO#: 23685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waterloo Walk-In Clinic
170 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3E9
Phone: (519) 725-1514
Fax: (519) 725-5137
Electoral District: 03

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place North York, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093
Date Received: 12 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY ALAN POLEVOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLEVOY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990