Polidoulis, Irene (CPSO#: 55959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 414
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-2662
Fax: (416) 439-0760
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRENE POLIDOULIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLIDOULIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1986