Pollack, Sheldon Victor (CPSO#: 27386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-9620
Fax: (416) 922-4358
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 26 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON VICTOR POLLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 07 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2004

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 2003
Summary:

On September 8, 2003, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Sheldon Victor Pollack’s plea of 
no contest for injecting silicone in 20 or more patients despite informing Health Canada and the 
College that he discontinued this practice.  The Committee found that Dr. Pollack had committed 
an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice 
of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, which is an act of professional 
misconduct as defined in paragraph 1 (1) 33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed the following penalty: 
 
1)   That the Registrar suspend Dr. Sheldon Victor Pollack’s certificate of registration for a 
     period of six months effective immediately. 
 
2)    That the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Sheldon 
      Victor Pollack’s certificate of registration: 
      (i)   Dr. Pollack is to successfully complete the College of Physician and Surgeons of 
            Ontario (“CPSO”) ethics course, at his own expense; 
       
      (ii)  Dr. Pollack is to consent to an independent audit of his practice to identify all 
            patients injected with injectable grade liquid silicone (“IGLS”) after May 8, 1999. 
             The assessor is to be an individual approved by the College and the cost of the 
            audit and any related activities is to be the responsibility of Dr. Pollack; 
       
      (iii) Dr. Pollack will send a letter (in a form approved by the College) to all patients 
            who received IGLS after May 8, 1999 advising them of the fact; 
                                     
      (iv)  Dr. Pollack will send a letter (in a form approved by the College) to all patients 
            who received Artecoll after May 8, 1999 advising them of the fact and reassuring 
            them that they did not receive IGLS; 
       
      (v)   Dr. Pollack is to prepare an addendum or correction notice to his charts (in a form 
            approved by the College) to ensure that the charts accurately reflect that patients 
            received IGLS after May 8, 1999. 
       
      3.    The Discipline Committee directs that the Registrar is to remove the above-noted 
            terms and conditions from Dr. Pollack’s certificate of registration when the 
            College receives: 
       
      (i)   written confirmation that Dr. Pollack has successfully completed the CPSO ethics 
            course; and 
 
      (ii)  the College receives written confirmation from the assessor that the audit has been 
            completed, that the charts have been corrected as required by paragraph 3(v) 
            above and that Dr. Pollack has written to all patients who received IGLS or 
            Artecoll after May 8, 1999 as required by paragraph 3(iii) and 3(iv). 
 
4.    That Dr. Pollack pay costs of the proceeding fixed in the amount of $2500 on or 
      before the completion of his suspension.  
        
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 2003