Pollak, Michael Norbert (CPSO#: 30716)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2002