Pollett, Aaron Frederick (CPSO#: 69020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pathology and Laboratory Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6452
Fax: (416) 586-8628
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-4530
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON FREDERICK POLLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000