Pollett, Judith Anne Whittaker (CPSO#: 26710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Free University of Berlin, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pain Care Clinics
Unit 2
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE WHITTAKER POLLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1981 to 16 Oct 1981
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 03 May 1982 to 04 Jul 1982
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1982 to 01 Oct 1982
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Feb 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008