Pollock, Bruce Godfrey (CPSO#: 51707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
and Mental Health
33 Russell Street, T109
Toronto ON  M5S 2S1
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36890
Fax: (416) 979-4704
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE GODFREY POLLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLLOCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2005