Pollock, Piney (CPSO#: 15173)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1955
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 2008

Concerns

Source: Executive Committee
Active Date: October 31, 2008
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Piney Pollock to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, DR. PINEY POLLOCK:

1). Hereby resign from the College, effective October 31, 2008.
3). Undertake not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
4). Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as public information.
5). Acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees to withdraw the referral to the Discipline Committee, as alleged in the Notice of Hearing dated September 4, 2008, for failing to maintain standard of practice of the profession and incompetence.
6). By entering into this undertaking, do not admit any of the allegations contained in the Notice of Hearing dated September 4, 2008 (the “Notice”). 8). Agree that if the College should became aware that I have applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, proceed with the prosecution of the allegations contained in the Notice.