Polsinelli, Kristina (CPSO#: 76065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

544 Armstrong Rd
Kingston ON  K7M 7N8
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

144 Brock St
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristina Polsinelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Polsinelli ( CPSO# 76065 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 533-2952

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINA POLSINELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POLSINELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003