Polson, Alasdair Leslie (CPSO#: 54141)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1996