Pomerleau, Marjorie (CPSO#: 89115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre Medical St-Isidore
4553 Ste Catherine
St Isidore ON  K0C 2B0
Phone: (613) 524-3225
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJORIE POMERLEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POMERLEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011