Pommerville, Peter John Joseph Osias (CPSO#: 31360)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 21 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 1978 to 15 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009