Pommier, Eugene Maurice (CPSO#: 26689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

438 Concord Avenue
Toronto ON  M6H 2P8
Canada
Phone: (416) 6597524
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Pommier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pommier ( CPSO# 26689 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Sep 2003 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Eugene Maurice Pommier may practise medicine only as a surgical assistant.