Pon, Kucy (CPSO#: 70078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
M1-700 Sunnybrook Dermatology
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4908
Fax: (416) 480-6897
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kucy Pon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pon ( CPSO# 70078 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
M1-700 Dermatology
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4908

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KUCY PON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001